Lindzon, Gillian Michelle (CPSO#: 95645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glengrove Medical Centre
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2
Phone: (416) 481-1173
Fax: (416) 481-7431
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Lindzon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lindzon ( CPSO# 95645 )

Business Address:
Glengrove Medical Centre
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 481-1173

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN MICHELLE LINDZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDZON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014