Lines, Matthew Alexander (CPSO#: 86482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Metabolics
3rd Floor Max Keeping Wing
C H E O
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2821
Fax: (613) 738-4216
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Lines Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lines ( CPSO# 86482 )

Business Address:
C H E O
Metabolics
3rd Floor Max Keeping Wing
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ALEXANDER LINES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013