Ling, Constance Marie (CPSO#: 72722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 725-1870
Fax: (613) 725-1647
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital- Riverside Campus
Shirley E. Greenberg Women's Health
Centre, 7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital-Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4573
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Ling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ling ( CPSO# 72722 )
Dr. R. Sahajpal ( CPSO# 73134 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 725-1870

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONSTANCE MARIE LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998