Ling, Hubert Hin Fai (CPSO#: 60134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 208
20 Wynford Drive
Don Mills ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 441-2111
Fax: (416) 441-2114
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2025 Midland Avenue, Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1P 3P2
Canada
Phone: 6473413832
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: 4162939402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. H. F. Ling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2006


Corporation Name: H. H. F. Ling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ling ( CPSO# 60134 )

Business Address:
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Suite 125
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Business Address:
2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1P 3P2
Phone Number: (647) 341-3832

Business Address:
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 293-9402

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
208 - 120 Wynford Drive
Don Mills ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 441-2111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUBERT HIN FAI LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1988