Ling, Ling (CPSO#: 105472)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. 22719
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: Norfolk General Hospital 365 West Street Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Date Received: 24 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2015 to 05 Apr 2015
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 03 Aug 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018