Ling, Michael Chi-Yen (CPSO#: 75086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 297-7277
Fax: (416) 299-4842
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael C. Ling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ling ( CPSO# 75086 )

Business Address:
404 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 297-7277

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHI-YEN LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005