Ling, Simon Christopher (CPSO#: 73963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jun 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8757
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Simon Christopher Ling may practise medicine only,

                  (a)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr. Ling holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (b)   in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr.  Ling no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.