Lingas, Rania Irene (CPSO#: 81034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B9
Phone: (416) 530-6235
Fax: (416) 530-6656
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rania Lingas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lingas ( CPSO# 81034 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B9
Phone Number: (416) 530-6235

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANIA IRENE LINGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINGAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 06 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 07 Oct 2009 to 06 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010