Lipson, David (CPSO#: 83053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3619
Fax: (416) 285-3764
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

760 Birchmount Rd #33
Scarborough ON  M1K 5H8
Canada
Phone: (416) 757-6296
Fax: (416) 757-3771
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Lipson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lipson ( CPSO# 83053 )

Business Address:
Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 597-3266

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID LIPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)