Liquornik, Morrie Stephen (CPSO#: 63412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Business Centre
16700 Bayview Avenue
Suite 216
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 836-4696
Fax: (905) 836-9038
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Liquornik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Liquornik ( CPSO# 63412 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Business Address:
Bayview Business Centre
216 - 16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 836-4696

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORRIE STEPHEN LIQUORNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIQUORNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1991