Lira Lea-Plaza, Gonzalo Rafael (CPSO#: 92147)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Chile, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 29 Sep 2009 to 18 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 19 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012