Liston, James Peter (CPSO#: 30706)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Liston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Liston ( CPSO# 30706 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: J. Liston 134 5th Line Fraserville, ON K0L 1V0
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018