Little, Ken Q (CPSO#: 106806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
College Street Site
Department of Psychiatry
841 - 250 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 979-4275
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Ken Q Little shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate
                  medical  education  program  in  which  Dr.  Little  is  enrolled  at the
                  University of Toronto.

            (2)   In  Dr.  Little's practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Little  shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of
                  a clinical teaching  unit that is formally affiliated with the department
                  where  Dr.  Little  is  properly   practising   medicine   and  to  which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr. Little's practice in the postgraduate medical education  program,
                  Dr. Little shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Little may practise psychiatry and to the extent of his employment at
                  Ontario   Shores  Centre  for  Mental  Health,  while  under  supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Little's  practice  specified in paragraph (4), Dr. Little may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate of registration  expires,  and Dr. Little must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Little is no longer enrolled in  a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr.  Little  no longer holds Canadian citizenship,  permanent
                        resident status, or  a  valid  employment  authorization  under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This   certificate  automatically  converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Little must immediately cease all practice
                  outside  the  postgraduate  medical  education  program if any one of the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4)  notifies the College of
                        any  concerns regarding Dr. Little's practice,  including  but  not
                        limited   to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Little's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Little  to  engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr. Little's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr.  Little  takes  a  leave of absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the postgraduate  education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion   to   a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Little may not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Little  applies  for  a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  24,  2018.   In accordance  with
                  paragraph  6(a),  this certificate of registration expires  on  June  30,
                  2019.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside  the   postgraduate   medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.