Liu, Angela Yuan (CPSO#: 108691)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 May 2016 to 29 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2018 to 21 Sep 2018
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2016