Liu, Louis Wing Cheong (CPSO#: 72264)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Gastroenterology
Toronto Western Hospital
8 M P 329
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5276
Fax: (416) 603-6204
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Louis Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Liu ( CPSO# 72264 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5276

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS WING CHEONG LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002