Liu, Pamela Yu-Wah (CPSO#: 86834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lawrence Heights CHC
12 Flemington Road
Toronto ON  M6A 2N4
Phone: (416) 787-1661
Fax: (416) 787-3761
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA YU-WAH LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2009