Liu, Theresa Tina (CPSO#: 82727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Infectious Diseases Clinic
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4348
Fax: (519) 749-4250
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

29 Young Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2L4
Canada
Phone: (519) 603-0223
Fax: (519) 888-6422
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: 519-744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

110-77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Canada
Phone: (519) 780-5298
Fax: (519) 780-5060
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roth Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Liu ( CPSO# 82727 )
Dr. K. Roth ( CPSO# 86756 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
110 - 77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 780-5298

Business Address:
1844 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N3H 3R9
Phone Number: (519) 277-4515

Business Address:
29 Young Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 603-0223

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Infectious Diseases Clinic
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4348

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THERESA TINA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009