Liu, Yan (CPSO#: 73605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311 Commercial Street
Suite 209
Milton Ontario
L9T 3Z9
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 636-8876
Fax: (905) 636-0606
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Liu ( CPSO# 73605 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 636-8876

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAN LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003