Liu, Yi (CPSO#: 83904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Fujian Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2942 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2T4
Phone: (416) 756-2725
Fax: (416) 756-3898
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yi Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Liu ( CPSO# 83904 )

Business Address:
2942 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2T4
Phone Number: (416) 756-2725

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 27 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008