Lloyd, Robert Jeffrey (CPSO#: 63997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Room HSC 3Y
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76610
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76610
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

293 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 8E7
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46827
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RJ Lloyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lloyd ( CPSO# 63997 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
H S C 3Y
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
293 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 8E7
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JEFFREY LLOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LLOYD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 1996 to 04 Feb 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998