Lo, Aaron Ngar-Luen (CPSO#: 91414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 217
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 844-9054
Fax: (905) 844-5352
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron N. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lo ( CPSO# 91414 )

Business Address:
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 217
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 844-9054

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON NGAR-LUEN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 25 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 22 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2017