Concerns
Source:
Florida Board of Medicine
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: December 18, 2019
Summary:
Effective December 18, 2019, the Florida Board of Medicine approved and adopted a Settlement Agreement between Dr. Eric Lup-Sing Lo and the Florida Department of Health as an Order of the Board. Dr. Lo was alleged to have violated Florida Statutes as a result of the action taken against Dr. Lo by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in October 2018 when Dr. Lo entered into an undertaking which imposed certain requirements on Dr. Lo, and (b) by not reporting the CPSO action and providing information about the CPSO action and Undertaking to the Florida Board within requisite time periods. The following penalties were imposed: a letter of concern against Dr. Lo’s medical license and a fine of $1500. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on December 24, 2019.
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: August 12, 2019
Summary:
On August 13, 2019, the Kentucky Board of Medical Licensure entered into an Agreed Order with Dr. Eric Lup-Sing Lo. The Kentucky Board found that Dr. Lo had violated Kentucky law (a) as a result Dr. Lo having entered into an Undertaking with CPSO on October 1, 2018 which imposed certain requirements on Dr. Lo, and (b) by not reporting the CPSO action and providing a copy of the CPSO Undertaking to the Kentucky Board within 10 days of the date of the Undertaking. The Order of the Kentucky Board requires Dr. Lo to submit copies of summaries of CPSO policies and clinical practice guidelines that Dr. Lo was required to write pursuant to the CPSO Undertaking, copies of reassessment reports related to the CPSO Undertaking and a fine of $1.00. CPSO was notified of this action by a report received on August 19, 2019.
On May 29, 2020, the Kentucky Board terminated the 2019 Order.