Lo, Henry (CPSO#: 94576)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Nov 2010 to 21 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2014