Lo, James Wai-Bong (CPSO#: 84868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: (705) 435-5138
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GSH Medical
801 Eglinton Avenue West, Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Canada
Phone: 416-789-2449
Fax: 416-789-2253
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

GSH Medical Markham
7155 Woodbine Ave Suite 106
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: 416-789-2449
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

19 Hospital Drive, Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: 705 658-4544
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lo ( CPSO# 84868 )

Business Address:
Box 664
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Business Address:
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 789-2449

Business Address:
Clarity Eye Institute
105 - 8800 Dufferin Street
Vaughan ON  L4K 0C5
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Business Address:
Unit 100
801 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 789-2449

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WAI-BONG LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2009