Lobo, Daniela Sabbatini da Silva (CPSO#: 88356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Room 321
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 33932
Fax: 416-599-1324
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELA SABBATINI DA SILVA LOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2015