Lochnan, Heather Anne (CPSO#: 55761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81941
Fax: (613) 738-8396
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lochnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lochnan ( CPSO# 55761 )

Business Address:
Suite 4-06
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE LOCHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1988