Lodenquai, Gregory Michael (CPSO#: 72404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
George Hull Centre for
Children and Families
81 The East Mall
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W3
Phone: (416) 622-8833 Ext. 227
Fax: (416) 622-7068
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Lodenquai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lodenquai ( CPSO# 72404 )

Business Address:
George Hull Centre for Children and Families
Third Floor
81 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W3
Phone Number: (416) 622-8833

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY MICHAEL LODENQUAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LODENQUAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2003 to 08 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003