Loh, Alvin Wern Howe (CPSO#: 75071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Surrey Place
Toronto ON  M5S 2C2
Phone: (416) 925-5141 Ext. 2335
Fax: (416) 929-8199
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALVIN WERN HOWE LOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004