Loh, Eldon (CPSO#: 89735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4080
Fax: (519) 685-4081
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eldon Loh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Loh ( CPSO# 89735 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institue
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELDON LOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 2008 to 24 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011