Loh, James Alexander (CPSO#: 97494)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 21 May 2012 to 01 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 10 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2014 to 19 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2014 to 17 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2014