Lohmann, Tara Ellen (CPSO#: 88204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  04 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 02 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Apr 2008 to 04 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Respirology

Queen's University, 20 Feb 2012 to 09 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Tara  Ellen Lohmann may practise medicine only as a Camp Doctor with
                  YMCA Camp Queen Elizabeth in Honey Harbour, Ontario.

            2.    The certificate  is  issued  for  the  term of July 29, 2018 to August 4,
                  2018.