Long, Michael Douglas (CPSO#: 95477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9
Phone: (807) 285-1894
Fax: (807) 285-2098
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6001
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.D. Long Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Long ( CPSO# 95477 )

Business Address:
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9
Phone Number: (807) 285-1894

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DOUGLAS LONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013