Longstaffe, Robert Craig (CPSO#: 108194)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fowler Kennedy Sport
Medicine Clinic, 3M Centre
University Of Western Ontario
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3011
Electoral District: 02

Medical Records Location

Address: Western University 3M Centre 1151 Richmond St London ON N6A 3K7
Date Received: 17 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Nov 2015 to 11 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018