Lopez Blanco, Alejandra Victoria (CPSO#: 83510)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 27 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Apr 2007