Lorde, Ingrid Lynette Adelle (CPSO#: 86595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1849 Yonge St
Suite 701
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416)487-9309
Fax: (416) 487-9790
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INGRID LYNETTE ADELLE LORDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009