Lorenzo, Armando Jose (CPSO#: 81424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De Panama, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Urology
Room 299
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6580
Fax: (416) 813-7869
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 10 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARMANDO JOSE LORENZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORENZO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009