Loreto, Michael Peter (CPSO#: 86800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 3739
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael P. Loreto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loreto ( CPSO# 86800 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
North Shore Health Network Blind River
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PETER LORETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORETO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012