Lorette, Jason Gary Wade (CPSO#: 92953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CFB Trenton
24 Health Services Center
PO Box 1000
Belleville ON  K8P 1M1
Phone: (902) 670-8281
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

274 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Canada
Phone: 613-968-5709
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V5S6
Canada
Phone: 613-392-2540
Fax: 613-392-3749
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON GARY WADE LORETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015