Lortie, Karine Josee (CPSO#: 82165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4289 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1E 0A8
Phone: (613) 686-1911
Fax: (613) 830-1901
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karine J. Lortie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lortie ( CPSO# 82165 )

Business Address:
4289 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K1E 0A8
Phone Number: (613) 686-1911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 22 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARINE JOSEE LORTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORTIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009