Losier, Andrea Michelle (CPSO#: 72165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2328
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MICHELLE LOSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOSIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2000 to 18 Dec 2000
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004