Lottering, Wilraad De Meyer (CPSO#: 83704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: (905) 623-9607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Lottering Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lottering ( CPSO# 83704 )

Business Address:
222 King Street East
2nd Floor
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-4424

Business Address:
2320 Durham Highway 2
Store 1001
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P9
Phone Number: (905) 697-1466

Business Address:
GH Strathaven
264 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P9
Phone Number: (905) 623-2553

Business Address:
GH Marnwood
26 Elgin Street
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3C8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILRAAD DE MEYER LOTTERING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOTTERING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006