Lou, Tjin-Yinn Justin (CPSO#: 75070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Doctor's Office
2299 Dundas Street West, Suite 406
Toronto ON  M6R 1X7
Phone: (416) 535-3511
Fax: (416) 535-5993
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Justin Lou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lou ( CPSO# 75070 )

Business Address:
Trillium Doctor's Office
2299 Dundas Street West
Suite 406
Toronto ON  M6R 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 535-3511

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TJIN-YINN JUSTIN LOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002