Lougheed, Daryl Brandon (CPSO#: 84801)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Lougheed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lougheed ( CPSO# 84801 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Business Address:
205 Gar Lehman Avenue
Stouffville ON  L4A 1V6
Phone Number: (647) 231-9000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARYL BRANDON LOUGHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGHEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008