Loughlin, Kevin Francis (CPSO#: 71555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Reddendale Medical Clinic
125 Lakeview Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 3T6
Phone: 613-384-4664
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Loughlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Loughlin ( CPSO# 71555 )

Business Address:
Reddendale Medical Clinic
125 Lakeview Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 3T6
Phone Number: (613) 384-4664

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN FRANCIS LOUGHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGHLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1999