Louis, Ihab Kamal (CPSO#: 81233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Centre of Plastic Surgery
22 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 726-2800
Fax: (705) 726-2851
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Barrie Endoscopy clinic
5 Quarry Ridge Road, LL1
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 797-1112
Fax: (705) 797-1113
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ihab K. Louis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Louis ( CPSO# 81233 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite LL
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 726-2800

Business Address:
22 Quarry Ridge
Suite LL
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-1112

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IHAB KAMAL LOUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 07 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008