Louis, Lenus Sukirtharajah (CPSO#: 97517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 May 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5117 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1C1
Phone: 416-482-1980
Fax: 6475591248
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lenus S. Louis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Louis ( CPSO# 97517 )

Business Address:
5117 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M9A 1C1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Lenus Sukirtharajah Louis may practise medicine independently limited
                  to   primary   care   medicine,  excluding  obstetrics,  gynaecology  and
                  paediatrics.