Louridas, Marisa (CPSO#: 93247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Queen Wing North
Room 3073
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5W 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5481
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.G. Zywiel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zywiel ( CPSO# 92977 )
Dr. M. Louridas ( CPSO# 93247 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Suite 1E427
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5359

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Queen Wing North
Room 3073
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5W 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARISA LOURIDAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOURIDAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018