Lovshin, Julie Ann Louise (CPSO#: 82946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room H141, H Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5049
Fax: 416-480-5400
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. D. McReelis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lovshin ( CPSO# 82946 )
Dr. K. McReelis ( CPSO# 75147 )

Business Address:
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6879

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANN LOUISE LOVSHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVSHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 05 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012