Low, Stephanie Alena Wong (CPSO#: 100958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ophthalmology & Vision Sciences
Department Administration
Room 400
340 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 978-4321
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ALENA WONG LOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018