Lozano, Marina (CPSO#: 88691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Tapiola Cres
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1T 2J7
Phone: (613) 738-0303
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marina Lozano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lozano ( CPSO# 88691 )

Business Address:
25 Tapiola Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1T 2J7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARINA LOZANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOZANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010